Vedic Maths is a gift given to this world by the ancient scholars of India. The name Vedic Maths is derived from a Sanskrit word ‘Veda’ which means ‘Knowledge’. It is a collection of techniques to solve maths problems in an easy and faster way. By Vedic methods, ‘difficult’ problems or long sums can be solved immediately. The simplicity of Vedic Mathematics means that calculations can be carried out mentally. It also lends a helping hand as you progress to higher classes because Vedic Maths always has a shorter way for solving quadratic and other polynomial functions and equations that one would encounter in higher classes.

Here, we will tell you 10 Vedic Maths tricks to solve your Maths problems with higher accuracy and in the least time. These tricks will help in reducing the dependency on the calculators even for the bigger calculations. The importance of these trick is most realized in the exams where time is less and questions are more like IMO, SSC, JEE, Banking Exams, etc.

**Let us learn Vedic Maths:**

**#1. Squaring of a number ending with 5**

In this Vedic Maths trick, you would learn how quickly squaring a two-digit number ending in 5.

Multiply the first digit on the left with itself + 1 and put 25 on the end. That is all!

For example: Find (45) ² =?

** Step 1**. 45 x 45 = …….25 (in the end)

*Step 2.*** 4x (4+1)** = 4 x 5 = 20

Hence the answer will be **2025.**

Now try —– 25, 35, 55, 65, 75, 85, 95.

**#2. Multiplying any number by 5**

Most students memorize the 5 times tables very easily, but when you get into larger numbers it gets more complex – isn’t it? But don’t worry! This trick is super easy.

Take any number, then divide it by 2 (in other words, half the number). If the result is whole, add a 0 at the end. If it is not, ignore the remainder and add a 5 at the end. It works every time:

For example: 2462 x 5 =?

** Step 1**. 2462 / 2 = 1231

** Step 2.** Whole number, so add 0

The answer will be 2462 x 5 = **12310**

Let’s try another: 3773 x 5

** Step 1 **3773 / 2 = 1886.5

** Step 2.** Fractional number, so ignore remainder and add 5

The answer will be 3773 x 5 = **18865**

Now try —- 123 x 5, 3456 x 5, 9876 x 5, 6754 x 5, 8796 x 5

**#3. Subtraction from 1000, 10000, 100000 and so on.**

This Vedic Maths Subtraction trick is very useful for getting instant subtraction result of any large number from 1000, 1000……so on. You just keep one formula – *Subtract all from 9 and the last from 10*.

For example: 1000 – 473 =? (Subtraction from 1000)

We simply subtract each figure in 473 from 9 and the last figure from 10.

** Step 1.** 9 – 4 = 5

** Step 2.** 9 – 7 = 2

** Step 3.** 10 – 3 = 7

So, the answer is 1000 – 473 = 527

Now try… 1000 – 357, 10,000 – 1049, 10,000 – 1064, 1000 – 397.

**#4. Multiplication of any 2-digit numbers, from 11 to 19**

By using this trick, you can multiply any two-digit number from 11 to 19 quickly. No wonder if generously practiced, it can give result faster than calculator! Have a look on the 4 steps involved in it:

** Step 1.** Add the unit digit of smaller no. to the larger numeral.

** Step 2**. Multiply the result by 10.

** Step 3.** Multiply the unit digits of both numbers.

** Step 4.** Add both the numbers (involve in step 1 & step 2).

For example: Take 2 numbers like 13 and 16.

*Step 1.* 16 + 3 =19.

*Step 2*. 19*10 = 190.

*Step 3*. 3*6 = 18

*Step 4.* Add the two numbers, 190+18 and the answer is **208**.

Now try…15*17, 17*13, 18*14, 13*19

**#5. Dividing a large number by 5**

This trick will get you result quickly of dividing a large digit number by 5. All you need to follow only two steps, in first step multiply the number by 2 while in second step move the decimal point.

For example: 235 / 5 =**?**

** Step 1.** 235 * 2 = 470

**Move the decimal: 47.0 or just 47**

*Step 2.*Let’s try another: 2128 / 5

*Step 1:* 2128 * 2 = 4256*Step2:* Move the decimal: 425.6 or just 425

Now try…. 6951/5, 2212/5, 4751/5, 1962/5, 8542/5.

**#6. Multiplication of a two-digit number by 11**

With this trick, multiplication can be done in 1 or 2 seconds. So, let us see how using this method, calculation can be done in a matter of seconds.

To multiply 25 and 11, imagine there is a space between 25** Step 1.** Put an imaginary space in between: 25*11= 2_5

**Just add 2 and 5 and put the result in the imaginary space**

*Step 2.*So, the answer is: 25 * 11 =

**275**

Let’s try another:

42 * 11 = 4 (4+2) 2 = **462**

Now try…17*11, 35*11, 15*11, 19*11, 18*11.

**#7. Multiply any large number by 12**

To multiply any number by 12 just double last digit and thereafter double each digit and add it to its neighbour.

For example 13243 * 12 = ?

Let’s break it into simple steps:** Step 1.** 13243 * 12 = _____6 (Double of Last Digit 3= 6 )

**13243 * 12 = ____16 (Now Double 4= 8, and add it to 3, 8+3=11, 1 will get carry over )**

*Step 2.***13243 * 12= ___916 (Now Double 2=4, and add it to 4 with carry, 4+4+1=9)**

*Step 3.***13243* 12= __8916 (Now Double 3=6, and add it to 2, 6+2=8)**

*Step 4.***13243 * 12= _58916 (Now Double 1=2, and add it to 3, 1+3=5)**

*Step 5.***. 13243 * 12= 158916 (Now Double 0=0, and add it to 1, 0+1=1)**

*Step 6*So your final answer of 13243 * 12 =

**158916**

Now try…2431*12, 1256*12, 1964*12, 7236*12.

**#8. Multiplication of any 3-digit numbers**

Take any two numbers like 308 and 306** Step 1. **Now subtract the number at unit place.

308-8=300

306-6=300

**Now select any number and add the unit digit of another number**

*Step 2.*308+6=314

**Now multiply, 314×300 = 94200**

*Step 3.***Now multiply the unit digits of both numbers, 8×6=48**

*Step 4.***Add, 94200+48 = 94248**

*Step 5.*The product of the numbers 308 and 306 is

**94248**

Now try…208*206, 508*504, 408*406.

**#9. Convert kilograms to pounds quickly**

If you want to convert kilograms to pounds, you can do it in your head in few seconds.

Let take an example: Convert 112 Kg to pound.** Step 1.** Multiply Kg value by 2

112*2= 224

**Divide the previous one by 10**

*Step 2.*224/10=22.4

**Add both the number**

*Step 3.*224+ 22.4=

**246.4 pounds**.

**#10. Trick for finding any square:**

Finding square of any number in Vedic maths is extremely easy. Just follow the given steps:

** Step 1.**Choose a base closer to the number whose square is to be found.

** Step 2.** Find the difference of the number from its base.

** Step 3.** Add the difference with the number.

** Step 4.** Multiply the result with the base.

** Step 5.** Add the product of the square of the difference with the result of the above point.

Let’s take an example to understand this: (99) ² =?

*Step 1.* Choose 100 as base

*Step 2.* Difference =99-100 = -1

*Step 3*. Number + difference = 99 + (-1) = 98

*Step 4 .* Multiplying result with base = 98*100 = 9800

*Step 5.* Adding result with square of difference= 9800 + (-1)² = **9801**

Now try… (98)², (97)², (102)², (101)².

We hope you will find these Vedic Maths Tricks useful to solve Maths Problems quickly.